Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0015149 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0015149



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 885
10.01.1995 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 14
29.04.1991 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.10.1988 Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent Search / examination 1
16.08.1988 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
16.08.1988 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.06.1988 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
10.06.1988 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.06.1988 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.06.1988 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
30.05.1988 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
13.05.1988 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
07.05.1988 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
07.05.1988 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.04.1988 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
26.03.1988 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
24.03.1988 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
24.03.1988 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
24.03.1988 F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) Appeal 2
23.03.1988 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
08.10.1987 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
02.10.1987 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
02.10.1987 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 21
02.10.1987 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
02.10.1987 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
08.09.1987 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
27.08.1987 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
10.02.1987 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
23.12.1986 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 7
23.12.1986 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
23.12.1986 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 24
23.12.1986 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
23.12.1986 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 17
23.12.1986 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
13.11.1986 F3040 Term extension: Yes/No Appeal 1
10.11.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
24.10.1986 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
23.09.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
23.09.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 3
23.06.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.06.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.06.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
05.06.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
03.06.1986 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 6
03.06.1986 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 5
08.05.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
08.05.1986 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
10.04.1986 Processing of an appeal Search / examination 1
03.04.1986 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
08.02.1986 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
04.02.1986 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
31.01.1986 Decision rejecting the opposition Search / examination 1
31.01.1986 Decision rejecting the opposition Search / examination 1
31.01.1986 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 14
31.01.1986 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Search / examination 4
17.12.1985 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 4
17.12.1985 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.12.1985 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
17.10.1985 Decision of the Opposition Division Search / examination 2
03.10.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.10.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.10.1985 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Search / examination 1
28.09.1985 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 8
12.09.1985 Brief communication to applicant/representative Search / examination 1
03.09.1985 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Search / examination 5
20.05.1985 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.05.1985 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
14.05.1985 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
10.05.1985 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.05.1985 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
08.05.1985 Summons to attend oral proceedings Opposition 1
19.04.1985 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.01.1985 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 4
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 7
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 14
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 21
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 20
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 31
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
10.01.1985 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 38
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 9
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 13
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 17
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 10
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 16
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 1
10.01.1985 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 24
10.01.1985 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
10.01.1985 Non-scannable object Opposition 1
10.01.1985 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
10.01.1985 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 23
14.11.1984 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.11.1984 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.09.1984 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
07.09.1984 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
10.05.1984 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
10.05.1984 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
28.03.1984 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.03.1984 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 48
22.03.1984 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
06.05.1983 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
21.03.1983 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
21.03.1983 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
21.03.1983 Translation of the claims Search / examination 7
27.12.1982 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 3
27.11.1982 Claims Search / examination 1
27.11.1982 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
14.10.1982 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
14.10.1982 Text intended for grant Search / examination 44
17.09.1982 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
01.06.1982 Abstract Search / examination 1
01.06.1982 Claims Search / examination 7
01.06.1982 Description Search / examination 17
01.06.1982 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
08.02.1982 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
07.02.1981 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
15.09.1980 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
20.08.1980 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
10.07.1980 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.06.1980 European search report Search / examination 1
25.05.1980 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
15.05.1980 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
08.04.1980 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
08.04.1980 Priority document Search / examination 46
03.04.1980 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
03.04.1980 Invitation to file priority document Search / examination 2
25.03.1980 Authorisation of representative Search / examination 1
25.03.1980 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
21.02.1980 Abstract Search / examination 2
21.02.1980 Claims Search / examination 6
21.02.1980 Description Search / examination 36
21.02.1980 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
21.02.1980 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5