EP0036048 - Startup method for a hydrocarbon reforming process utilizing a bed containing an iridium component and a platinum group component reforming catalyst having a substantially uniform sulfur distribution throughout the bed [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.1982 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Carter, James Leslie 933 St. Marks Avenue Westfield, New Jersey / US | 02 /
Sinfelt, John Henry 296 Chaucer Drive Berkeley Heights, New Jersey / US | [1981/38] | Representative(s) | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 12 Esso House, Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/38] | Somers, Harold Arnold, et al ESSO Engineering (Europe) Ltd. Patents & Licences Mailpoint 72 Esso House Ermyn Way Leatherhead, Surrey KT22 8XE / GB | Application number, filing date | 80300777.2 | 13.03.1980 | [1981/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036048 | Date: | 23.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1980 | Classification | IPC: | C10G35/22 | [1981/38] | CPC: |
C10G35/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/38] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Anfahren einer Reformierung von Kohlenwasserstoffen unter Verwendung eines eine Iridiumkomponente und eine Platingruppenmetallkomponente enthaltenden Katalysatorbettes, mit einer im wesentlichen einheitlichen Schwefelverteilung über das Bett | [1981/38] | English: | Startup method for a hydrocarbon reforming process utilizing a bed containing an iridium component and a platinum group component reforming catalyst having a substantially uniform sulfur distribution throughout the bed | [1981/38] | French: | Procédé de démarrage d'un procédé de reformage d'hydrocarbures utilisant un lit contenant un catalyseur de reformage comprenant de l'iridium et un métal du groupe du platine et ayant une distribution de soufre essentiellement uniforme dans le lit | [1981/38] | File destroyed: | 12.02.1989 | Examination procedure | 21.06.1982 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1982/48] | 01.09.1982 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1982/48] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.03.1982 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1982 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4048058 [ ]; | US4159938 [ ]; | US3578582 [ ]; | US3936369 [ ]; | US3939060 [ ]; | US3953368 [ ] |