|
21.06.2000 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
F3324 Closure of the appeal proceedings: withdrawal of the appeal/ application/ opposition |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2000 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2000 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2000 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2000 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2000 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
49 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2000 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2000 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.2000 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.12.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.1999 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1999 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
16.08.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
13.08.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.04.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.1999 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1999 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.02.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1999 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.1999 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.12.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1998 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.08.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.10.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
18.09.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
16.09.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
51 |
|
26.07.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
12.07.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
70 |
|
12.07.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1996 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
23 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
46 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
27.12.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.12.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
14 |
|
14.11.1995 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.1995 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
20 |
|
18.08.1995 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
25 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.1995 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.07.1995 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
29 |
|
26.06.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.06.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1995 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.05.1995 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
32 |
|
26.05.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.05.1995 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.1995 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.01.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.01.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.01.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1995 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1994 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.07.1994 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.07.1994 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
29 |
|
27.06.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.1994 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.1994 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.1994 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.1993 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (with time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1993 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1993 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.1993 |
Request for written evidence |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1993 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1993 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.10.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
16.10.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
28 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
61 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
13.10.1993 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.10.1993 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
29 |
|
14.01.1993 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1993 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.1992 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.1992 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
13.07.1992 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.1992 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1992 |
Grant of extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1992 |
Request for extension of time limit to announcement of intention to grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.1992 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.1991 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.12.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.07.1991 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
10.07.1991 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.07.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.1991 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
07.03.1991 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
19.11.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.11.1990 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.1990 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.03.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.03.1990 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
108 |
|
04.09.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
17 |
|
29.08.1989 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.02.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1987 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1987 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
19.06.1987 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1987 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.04.1987 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.02.1987 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1986 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1986 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
02.12.1986 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.05.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
20.05.1986 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
20.05.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.1986 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1986 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.1985 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
16.10.1985 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
10.10.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1985 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1985 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.07.1985 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.1985 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.1984 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.04.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.04.1984 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.04.1984 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.1984 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1984 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.1983 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.03.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.03.1983 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.01.1983 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1983 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.1983 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1982 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.09.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1981 |
Reminder: revised request form for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1981 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.1981 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.1980 |
Invitation to pay administrative fee for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1980 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1980 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.1980 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1980 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1980 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.09.1980 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.1980 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
24.07.1980 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
68 |
|
23.07.1980 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.07.1980 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1980 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.1980 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.1980 |
Deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.1980 |
Deficiencies in application documents |
Search / examination |
2 |