EP0039677 - RATIO SELECTING MECHANISM FOR A TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.01.1986 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL, SE | published on 19.03.1986 [1986/12] | Applicant(s) | For:CH
DE
LI
NL
SE
AT
Massey-Ferguson Services N.V. Abraham de Veerstraat 7A Curaçao / AN | For:FR
MASSEY FERGUSON S.A. La Boursidiere, RN 186 F-92350 le Plessis Robinson / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1981/46] | For:CH
DE
LI
NL
SE
AT
MASSEY-FERGUSON SERVICES N.V. Abraham de Veerstraat 7A Curaçao / AN | ||
For:FR
MASSEY FERGUSON S.A. La Boursidiere, RN 186 F-92350 le Plessis Robinson / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LASOEN, Jean Jacques 4, avenue des Prés Vendôme F-78450 Ville Preux / FR | [1981/46] | Representative(s) | Jones, David Bryn Massey-Ferguson Stareton near Kenilworth Warwickshire CV8 2LJ / GB | [1981/46] | Application number, filing date | 80901457.4 | 15.07.1980 | [1981/46] | WO1980EP00054 | Priority number, date | GB19790025590 | 23.07.1979 Original published format: GB 7925590 | [1981/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8100313 | Date: | 05.02.1981 | [1981/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0039677 | Date: | 18.11.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.02.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0039677 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/39] | Classification | IPC: | G05G9/08, F16H3/08 | [1981/46] | CPC: |
F16H37/043 (EP,US);
F16H61/0059 (EP,US);
F16H63/18 (EP,US);
F16H2059/088 (EP,US);
F16H59/02 (EP,US);
F16H61/70 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19279 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19284 (EP,US);
Y10T74/19391 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, LI, NL, SE [1981/46] | Title | German: | MECHANISMUS ZUM WÄHLEN DES ÜBERSETZUNGSVERHÄLTNISSES EINES GETRIEBES | [1981/46] | English: | RATIO SELECTING MECHANISM FOR A TRANSMISSION | [1981/46] | French: | MECANISME DE SELECTION DE RAPPORTS D'UNE TRANSMISSION | [1981/46] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.1981 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/46] | 20.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.02.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.06.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.09.1984 | CH | 26.09.1984 | LI | 26.09.1984 | NL | 26.09.1984 | SE | 26.09.1984 | [1986/12] |
Former [1985/25] | AT | 26.09.1984 | |
CH | 26.09.1984 | ||
LI | 26.09.1984 | ||
Former [1985/08] | CH | 26.09.1984 | |
LI | 26.09.1984 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR470486 (EUGENE H DEGORY [US]); | [A]US1716335 (AHLM CHARLES E F, et al); | [A]GB346255 (STURMEY ARCHER GEARS LTD, et al); | [A]FR794846 (ZURCHER & LA FERRIERE REUNIS); | [A]FR853448 ; | [A]FR929534 (RENE GILLET SA DES ETS); | [A]FR2299562 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) | Examination | GB1336709 |