EP0035545 - PROBES FOR THE ULTRASONIC TREATMENT OR INSPECTION OF MOLTEN ALUMINUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1985 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1985 [1985/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reynolds Metals Company 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, VA 23235 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/37] | For all designated states REYNOLDS METALS COMPANY 6601 West Broad Street Richmond, VA 23261 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANSFIELD, Thomas L. Route 5 Box 156D Louisa, VA 23093 / US | [1981/37] | Representative(s) | Bass, John Henton, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1981/37] | Application number, filing date | 80901825.2 | 13.08.1980 | [1981/37] | WO1980US01048 | Priority number, date | US19790074800 | 12.09.1979 Original published format: US 74800 | [1981/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8100768 | Date: | 19.03.1981 | [1981/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0035545 | Date: | 16.09.1981 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1981/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0035545 | Date: | 27.06.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/02 | [1981/37] | CPC: |
G01N29/2443 (EP,US);
G01N29/228 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0252 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/37] | Title | German: | SONDEN FÜR DIE ULTRASCHALLBEHANDLUNG ODER -PRÜFUNG GESCHMOLZENEN ALUMINIUMS | [1981/37] | English: | PROBES FOR THE ULTRASONIC TREATMENT OR INSPECTION OF MOLTEN ALUMINUM | [1981/37] | French: | SONDES POUR LE TRAITEMENT OU L'INSPECTION ULTRASONIQUE D'ALUMINIUM EN FUSION | [1981/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1981 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1981 | Search fee paid | 12.05.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/43] | 06.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.12.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3444726 [ ] (YOUNG REGINALD S, et al) | International search | [A] - N, Ultrasonic Examination of Liquid Metal, British Aluminum Co., Ltd., Research Laboratories Interview Report No. RL 63/8 by YOUNG et al, Published 15 March 1963 |