|
29.12.1994 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
02.08.1989 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.08.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.1989 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.1989 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.1989 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
13 |
|
30.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.01.1989 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.12.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
27.05.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
25.01.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1987 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.09.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
15.07.1987 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.1987 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
03.06.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1987 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1987 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1987 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1987 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.03.1987 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1987 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1987 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.1987 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
03.03.1987 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.11.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.10.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1986 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.1986 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1986 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.1986 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.03.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.01.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.11.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
31.10.1985 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.10.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1985 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1985 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.08.1985 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
29.04.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1985 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1985 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1985 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1985 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.1985 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.02.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.1985 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.01.1985 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1985 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1985 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.01.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
04.01.1985 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.01.1985 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.02.1984 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1983 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.1983 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.1983 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.09.1983 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.08.1983 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.1983 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.1983 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
04.05.1983 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.1982 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.08.1982 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.09.1981 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1981 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1981 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1981 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.06.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.1981 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
14.04.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.1981 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.04.1981 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1981 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1981 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
02.04.1981 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
23.10.1980 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.1980 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |