|
07.06.1999 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.01.1993 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1993 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.01.1993 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1992 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1992 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1992 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1992 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1992 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.10.1992 |
Indication of deficiencies in a request for entry of a change in personal particulars and invitation to correct them |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1992 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.10.1992 |
Request for assignment |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.10.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
24 |
|
07.04.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Description |
Appeal |
8 |
|
03.02.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.12.1991 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
26.11.1991 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.10.1991 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.09.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1991 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1991 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1991 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1991 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
24 |
|
20.07.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.1991 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1991 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.05.1991 |
Description |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.05.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1991 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.05.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.1991 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.01.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
17.01.1991 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.01.1991 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.01.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1990 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.12.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
06.12.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.12.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Description |
Appeal |
12 |
|
30.11.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.1990 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.1990 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.02.1990 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
31.07.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
21.07.1989 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.07.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1989 |
General authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.06.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1989 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.06.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1989 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.04.1989 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1989 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.1989 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
25 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.12.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.10.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.08.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.07.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.06.1988 |
Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.06.1988 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
32 |
|
08.06.1988 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.1988 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.04.1988 |
Description |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.04.1988 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.12.1987 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.12.1987 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.11.1987 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.09.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.07.1987 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
23.07.1987 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
09.07.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.04.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1987 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.01.1987 |
Description |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.01.1987 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
03.12.1986 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.1986 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1986 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.11.1986 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.11.1986 |
Description |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.11.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1986 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.09.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.09.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.1986 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.08.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1986 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.07.1986 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.07.1986 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1986 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.06.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.03.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1986 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.03.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.02.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.12.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.1985 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1985 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1985 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
05.10.1985 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1985 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1985 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.1985 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1985 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1985 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.06.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.06.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.09.1984 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1984 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.1984 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.1984 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.07.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.1984 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1984 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1984 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1984 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.05.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.1984 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.1984 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.12.1983 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.12.1983 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
24 |
|
08.12.1983 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.1983 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
25.01.1983 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.1981 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.1981 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.1981 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.10.1981 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.1981 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.08.1981 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.1981 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.08.1981 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.1981 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.08.1981 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.08.1981 |
Copy of the international search report |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.08.1981 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Opposition |
28 |
|
06.08.1981 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
06.08.1981 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.1980 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |