EP0033963 - Radial shaft sealing ring [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.1985 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.05.1985 [1985/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/33] | For all designated states Firma Carl Freudenberg Höhnerweg 2-4 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braconier, Karl 369 River Road Bridgewater, NH 03222 / US | [1981/33] | Representative(s) | Weissenfeld-Richters, Helga Höhnerweg 2 69469 Weinheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/33] | Weissenfeld-Richters, Helga, Dr. Höhnerweg 2 D-69469 Weinheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 81100876.2 | 07.02.1981 | [1981/33] | Priority number, date | US19800119297 | 07.02.1980 Original published format: US 119297 | [1981/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0033963 | Date: | 19.08.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0033963 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | DE | [1981/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0033963 | Date: | 16.05.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32 | [1981/33] | CPC: |
F16J15/3244 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1981/33] | Title | German: | Radialwellendichtring | [1981/33] | English: | Radial shaft sealing ring | [1981/33] | French: | Joint d'étanchéité de type radial | [1981/33] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1981 | Examination requested [1981/37] | 03.09.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.06.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.1983 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.08.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.02.1985 | No opposition filed within time limit [1985/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.02.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3501155 [ ] (DEGA ROBERT L, et al); | DE1525882 [ ] (STENSHOLMS FABRIKS AB); | FR2456888 [ ] (PROCAL) |