EP0042572 - Process for the production of copolymers with a high content of alpha-methylstyrene, thermoplastic resin compositions containing these copolymers and their use for the production of molded articles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1981/52] | Copolymers with a high content of alpha-methylstyrene, a process for their production and thermoplastic resin compositions containing these copolymers | ||
[1990/31] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.06.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | For all designated states KANEGAFUCHI KAGAKU KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-4 Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mathumoto, Sigemi 329, Nagao, Amido-cho Takasago-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 02 /
Nagoshi, Fumiya 9-36, 9-chome Nishimaiko Tarumi-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | [1981/52] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1981/52] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81104618.4 | 15.06.1981 | [1981/52] | Priority number, date | JP19800081860 | 16.06.1980 Original published format: JP 8186080 | [1981/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0042572 | Date: | 30.12.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0042572 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0042572 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1981 | Classification | IPC: | C08F212/12, C08L25/16, C08L51/04, // (C08F212/12, 220:44),(C08L25/16, 51:04),(C08L51/04, 25:16) | [1981/52] | CPC: |
C08L25/16 (EP,US);
C08F212/12 (EP,US);
C08L51/04 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F212/12, C08F220/44 (EP,US);
C08L25/16, C08L2666/24 (US,EP);
C08L25/16, C08L51/04 (US,EP);
C08L51/04, C08L25/16 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1981/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Copolymerisaten mit hohem Gehalt an alpha-Methylstyrol, thermoplastische Harzmischungen, welche diese Copolymerisate enthalten und ihre Verwendung zur Herstellung von Formteilen | [1990/31] | English: | Process for the production of copolymers with a high content of alpha-methylstyrene, thermoplastic resin compositions containing these copolymers and their use for the production of molded articles | [1990/31] | French: | Procédé de préparation de copolymères à teneur élevée en alpha-méthylstyrène, compositions de résines thermoplastiques contenant ces copolymères et leur utilisation pour la fabrication d'articles moulés | [1990/31] |
Former [1981/52] | Copolymerisate mit hohem Gehalt an alpha-Methylstyrol, Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung und thermoplastische Harzmischung, welche diese Copolymerisate enthält | ||
Former [1981/52] | Copolymers with a high content of alpha-methylstyrene, a process for their production and thermoplastic resin compositions containing these copolymers | ||
Former [1981/52] | Copolymères à teneur élevée en alpha-méthylstyrène, procédé pour leur préparation et compositions de résines thermoplastiques contenant ces copolymères | Examination procedure | 02.12.1981 | Examination requested [1982/06] | 13.12.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.04.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.03.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.06.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 27.06.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1985
04.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 02
05.07.1985
29.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Naamloze Vennootschap DSM Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL Opponent's representative Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1985
04.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
05.07.1985
29.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Naamloze Vennootschap DSM Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL Opponent's representative Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | |||
Former [1986/44] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1985
04.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
05.07.1985
29.07.1985
ADMISSIBLE Naamloze Vennootschap DSM Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL Opponent's representative Hoogstraten, Willem Cornelis Roeland OCTROOIBUREAU DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | |||
Former [1985/38] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1985
Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
02
05.07.1985
Naamloze Vennootschap DSM Het Overloon 1 NL-6411 TE Heerlen / NL Opponent's representative van Leeuwen, Hendrik Bernardus Octrooibureau DSM Postbus 9 NL-6160 MA Geleen / NL | |||
Former [1985/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.06.1985
ADMISSIBLE Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern Bayerwerk D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | 09.09.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.05.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.06.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M03) | 19.09.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 11.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 13.10.1987 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.01.1988 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 06.04.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 16.04.1989 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.07.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 19.10.1989 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1989/39] | BE | 30.06.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP55078007 ; | [AP]JP55078043 | [AP] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Volume 4, No. 124, 2nd September 1980 page 43 (C-23) & JP-A-55 078007 (Sumitomo Naugatuck) 6-12-1980 * Abstract *, & JP55078007 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Volume 4, No. 124, 2nd September 1980 page 53 (C-23) & JP-A-55 078043 (Sumitomo Naugatuck) 6-12-1980 * Abstract *, & JP55078043 A 00000000 |