|
14.12.1989 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.07.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.05.1989 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1989 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1989 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
22.02.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1988 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.11.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
19.09.1988 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.09.1988 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1988 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.06.1988 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.1988 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.10.1987 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1987 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1987 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1987 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.10.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.10.1987 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.1987 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1987 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1987 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1986 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.10.1986 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.10.1986 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1986 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.10.1986 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
17.09.1986 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.07.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.05.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.03.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.03.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.03.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1986 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.12.1985 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1985 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.09.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.09.1985 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
27.09.1984 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.1984 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.1984 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.03.1984 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1984 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.1984 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.02.1984 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
17.12.1983 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.1983 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1983 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.10.1983 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.1983 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.1983 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.04.1983 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Request for change of name of the applicant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.1982 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1982 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1982 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1982 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.1981 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1981 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
05.08.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.08.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
05.08.1981 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1981 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.08.1981 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |