EP0049764 - Incremental length or angle measuring device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.1987 [1987/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 83292 Traunreut / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/16] | For all designated states Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH Postfach 12 60 D-83292 Traunreut / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nelle, Günther, Dr.-Ing. Eichenweg 12 D-8221 Bergen / DE | [1982/16] | Application number, filing date | 81107126.5 | 10.09.1981 | [1982/16] | Priority number, date | DE19803037810 | 07.10.1980 Original published format: DE 3037810 | [1982/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0049764 | Date: | 21.04.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0049764 | Date: | 16.11.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049764 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01D5/26, G01D5/36, G01D5/245 | [1983/42] | CPC: |
G01D5/36 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/16] | G01D5/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, CH, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/16] | Title | German: | Inkrementale Längen- oder Winkelmesseinrichtung | [1982/16] | English: | Incremental length or angle measuring device | [1982/16] | French: | Dispositif de mesure incrémental des longueurs ou des angles | [1982/16] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 21.12.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.01.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.05.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.08.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]DE2540412 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES); | [Y]US4097734 (ERICKSON KENT E); | [P]DE2948854 (HEIDENHAIN GMBH DR JOHANNES [DE]) | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 19, Nr. 8, Januar 1977, Seiten 2872-2873, New York, USA; B.C. DILLON et al.: "Dual-scale travel sensor". | Examination | - Prospekt der Firma Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH, Traunreut, "Fertigungsprogramm 1973" und "Numerische Positionsanzeige", Sept. 1977 |