EP0048492 - Drowsiness alarm system for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.1989 [1989/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2, Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | For all designated states NISSAN MOTOR CO., LTD. 2 Takara-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seko, Yasutoshi 714, Nishiterao Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Yanagishima, Takayuki 15, Futaba 1-chome Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1982/13] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Straße 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1982/13] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 81107546.4 | 22.09.1981 | [1982/13] | Priority number, date | JP19800135094 | 22.09.1980 Original published format: JP 13509480 | JP19800132060 | 22.09.1980 Original published format: JP 13206080 | JP19800139661 | 06.10.1980 Original published format: JP 13966180 | [1982/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0048492 | Date: | 31.03.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0048492 | Date: | 17.11.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0048492 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G08B23/00, B60K28/00, G08B21/00 | [1982/46] | CPC: |
G08B23/00 (EP,US);
B60K28/066 (EP);
G08B21/06 (EP,US);
B60W2540/18 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1982/13] | G08B23/00, B60K28/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1982/13] | Title | German: | Schläfrigkeitswarnsystem für ein Auto | [1982/13] | English: | Drowsiness alarm system for a vehicle | [1982/13] | French: | Avertisseur d'assoupissement pour un véhicule | [1982/13] | Examination procedure | 16.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/10] | 25.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 23.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 27.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2042853 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [Y]US3654599 (SEPPER WERNER); | [Y]US4007357 (YANAGISHIMA TAKAYUKI); | [A]DE2509354 ; | [Y]US4104621 (YANAGISHIMA TAKAYUKI, et al) | Examination | EP0059225 |