|
14.01.1994 |
Transmission of the new certificate for a European patent pursuant to 87 EPC in conjunction with Rule 74 EPC |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.12.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1993 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.1993 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1993 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.07.1993 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1993 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
9 |
|
16.07.1993 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1993 |
Title page: Decision (inter partes / revocation of patent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
23 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.02.1993 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.02.1993 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
15.02.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.1993 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.02.1993 |
F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.02.1993 |
F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.12.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.12.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.11.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.11.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.1992 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.11.1992 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.11.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.11.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.11.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.10.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.10.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1992 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.07.1992 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1992 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
15 |
|
27.09.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.08.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.07.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.06.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
28.03.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
17 |
|
28.03.1991 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.03.1991 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
28.03.1991 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.10.1990 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.1990 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Communication issued by Treasury and Accounting |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.08.1988 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.08.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.08.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
37 |
|
18.08.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
39 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.1988 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1988 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1988 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.06.1988 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1988 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1988 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.04.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.04.1988 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.04.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
15 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1988 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.1988 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1988 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.1988 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.1987 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1987 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1987 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.10.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.1987 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.1987 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
18.08.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1987 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
11 |
|
17.07.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1987 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.03.1987 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.02.1987 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1986 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.10.1986 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1986 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.07.1986 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1986 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.05.1986 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
14.05.1986 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.1985 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.1985 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.1984 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.12.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.1984 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.1984 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.1984 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
27.04.1984 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.1984 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.1984 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.03.1984 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.03.1984 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.1984 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
17.12.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.1983 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.1983 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.08.1983 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
28.10.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1982 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1982 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.1982 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.01.1982 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.12.1981 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.1981 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1981 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.11.1981 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
27.10.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.10.1981 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.1981 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.10.1981 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.06.1981 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.02.1981 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.05.1979 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.1979 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.1979 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.1979 |
General authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Description |
Search / examination |
60 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
139 |
|
27.03.1979 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |