EP0049552 - Apparatus for coiling flexible stretched materials, particularly tubes or cables [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAVIN B.V. Händellaan 251 8031 EM Zwolle / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/15] | For all designated states WAVIN B.V. Händellaan 251 NL-8031 EM Zwolle / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Mos, Johannes 28 Heinbaaswijk NL-7701 PA Dedemsvaart / NL | [1982/15] | Representative(s) | Keijser, Johannes Maurits L.F. (NL), et al Exterpatent Silverpoint Building De Bruyn Kopsstraat 9 NL-2288 EC Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/15] | Keijser, Johannes Maurits L.F., et al Exterpatent Silverpoint Building De Bruyn Kopsstraat 9 NL-2288 EC Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 81201117.9 | 08.10.1981 | [1982/15] | Priority number, date | NL19800005571 | 08.10.1980 Original published format: NL 8005571 | [1982/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0049552 | Date: | 14.04.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0049552 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/58, B65H54/28 | [1982/15] | CPC: |
B65H54/28 (EP);
B65H54/58 (EP);
B65H2701/331 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Aufwickeln langgestreckten biegsamen Gutes, insbesondere Schläuche oder Kabel | [1982/15] | English: | Apparatus for coiling flexible stretched materials, particularly tubes or cables | [1982/15] | French: | Dispositif pour bobiner des matériaux flexibles filiformes, en particulier des tuyaux ou des câbles | [1982/15] | Examination procedure | 24.05.1982 | Examination requested [1982/32] | 10.06.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.09.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.10.1985 | CH | 31.10.1985 | LI | 31.10.1985 | LU | 31.10.1985 | [1999/52] |
Former [1991/51] | BE | 31.10.1985 | |
CH | 31.10.1985 | ||
LI | 31.10.1985 | ||
Former [1989/20] | CH | 31.10.1985 | |
LI | 31.10.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | GB109929 [ ] (WIT VINCENT DE [GB]); | US1827855 [ ] (PARKER LEE T); | US2264992 [ ] (MCCARTHY CHARLES M); | US2738161 [ ] (CHUPP OTIS H); | US2780421 [ ] (HERR RICHARD F); | US2946535 [ ] (MARION KENNETH O); | US3105653 [ ] (BECKWITH ALBERT C); | GB980903 [ ] (LICENTIA GMBH); | GB1152684 [ ] (TOSCA ALLESANDRO [IT], et al); | [A]US3576196 (ATNOSIAN MGRDICH G); | DE1574422 [ ] (ROSENDAHL WALTER); | DE2056895 [ ] (THAELMANN SCHWERMASCHBAU VEB); | GB1270819 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | [A]GB1328542 (BRITISH INSULATED CALLENDERS); | [A]GB1471051 (OLIVER G); | US4103841 [ ] (FLYNN THOMAS P, et al); | US4202512 [ ] (NICHOLSON THOMAS F JR [US]); | CH618141 [ ] (USINAGE TUBES POUR ELECTR) |