EP0052902 - Method and device for character segmentation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.05.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Staat der Nederlanden (Staatsbedrijf der Posterijen, Telegrafie en Telefonie) P.O. Box 430 NL-2260 AK Leidschendam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1982/22] | For all designated states Staat der Nederlanden (Staatsbedrijf der Posterijen, Telegrafie en Telefonie) P.O. Box 430 NL-2260 AK Leidschendam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Damen, Jozef Theodorus Wilhelmus Mozartlaan 40 NL-2264 VL Leidschendam / NL | 02 /
Tan, Hong Sie Herenwaard 137 NL-2716 XT Zoetermeer / NL | [1982/22] | Application number, filing date | 81201232.6 | 30.10.1981 | [1982/22] | Priority number, date | NL19800006371 | 21.11.1980 Original published format: NL 8006371 | [1982/22] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0052902 | Date: | 02.06.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.03.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/34 | [1982/22] | CPC: |
G06V30/158 (EP,US);
G06V30/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [1982/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Zeichentrennung | [1982/22] | English: | Method and device for character segmentation | [1982/22] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la segmentation de caractères | [1982/22] | File destroyed: | 01.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 02.12.1982 | Examination requested [1983/07] | 24.04.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1988/25] | 03.12.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.11.1987 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4206442 [ ] (HOSHINO YUKIO [JP], et al) | [ ] - Wissenschaftliche Berichte, Aeg-Telefunken, Volume 47, No. 3/4, 1974, Berlin (DE) J. SCHURMANN: "Bildvorbereitung fur die Automatische Zeichenerkennung"pages 90-99 | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Volume 21, No. 9, February 1979, Armonk (US) D.A. BISHOP et al.: "Character Recognition Approach Involving Histogram Classification"pages 3461-3467 | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Volume 1A, No. 10, March 1972, Armonk (US) R.J. BAUMGARTNER: "Character Pitch Determination"pages 3104-3107 | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Volume 23, No. 3, August 1980, Armonk (US) C.R. JIH.: "Segmentation Method for Fixed-Pitch and Machine-Printed Documents"page 1194 | [ ] - IBM, Journal of Research and Development, Volume 15, No. 2, March 1972, Armonk (US) R.L. HOFFMAN et al.: "Segmentatiobn Methods for Recognition of Machine-Printed Characters"pages 153-165 |