EP0033625 - Metal laminates, process for production thereof and coins made therefrom [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 19.08.1983 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Inco Research & Development Center, Inc. Sterling Forest Suffern New York 10901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1981/32] | For all designated states Inco Research & Development Center, Inc. Sterling Forest Suffern New York 10901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Peterson, Walter Adrian 132 Hamilton Road Ridgewood New Jersey 07450 / US | 02 /
Travis, Jonathan Adriel 15 Pierce Avenue Oak Ridge New Jersey 07438 / US | 03 /
Badia, Frank Arthur 13 West Circle Ringwood New Jersey 07456 / US | [1981/32] | Representative(s) | Greenstreet, Cyril Henry, et al Thames House (Fifth floor) Millbank London SW1P 4QF / GB | [1981/32] | Application number, filing date | 81300338.1 | 26.01.1981 | [1981/32] | Priority number, date | US19800114310 | 25.01.1980 Original published format: US 114310 | [1981/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0033625 | Date: | 12.08.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B32B15/01, A44C21/00 | [1981/32] | CPC: |
A44C21/00 (EP,US);
B32B15/01 (EP,US);
B32B15/015 (EP,US);
Y10S428/925 (EP,US);
Y10S428/926 (EP,US);
Y10S428/94 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1291 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12917 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12944 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12951 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1981/32] | Title | German: | Metallischer Mehrschichtwerkstoff, Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung und daraus hergestellte Münzen | [1981/32] | English: | Metal laminates, process for production thereof and coins made therefrom | [1981/32] | French: | Matériau métallique stratifié, procédé pour sa fabrication et pièces de monnaie obtenues à partir dudit matériau | [1981/32] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 03.02.1982 | Examination requested [1982/15] | 04.11.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.1983 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1983/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3750253 [ ] (MILLER E) |