EP0034912 - Device for use in the treatment of damaged articular surfaces of human joints [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.06.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. & P. Coats, Limited 155 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5PA Scotland / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/35] | For all designated states J. & P. Coats, Limited 155 St. Vincent Street Glasgow G2 5PA Scotland / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sully, Lance 143 Main Street Sutton Bonnigton Nottinghamshire / GB | 02 /
Jackson, Ian Thomas 2501 Institute Road, S.W. Rochester Minnesota 55901 / US | [1981/35] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1983/42] |
Former [1981/35] | Ferguson, James MacKay Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square Glasgow, G1 3AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81300653.3 | 18.02.1981 | [1981/35] | Priority number, date | GB19800005826 | 21.02.1980 Original published format: GB 8005826 | [1981/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0034912 | Date: | 02.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0034912 | Date: | 17.08.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1981 | Classification | IPC: | A61F1/03 | [1981/35] | CPC: |
A61F2/4241 (EP,US);
A61F2/30756 (EP,US);
A61F2/3601 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30563 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4233 (EP,US);
A61F2002/4243 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1981/35] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung von beschädigten Oberflächen menschlicher Gelenke | [1981/35] | English: | Device for use in the treatment of damaged articular surfaces of human joints | [1981/35] | French: | Dispositif pour le traitement de surfaces endommagées des articulations du corps humain | [1981/35] | Examination procedure | 27.08.1981 | Examination requested [1981/44] | 27.05.1982 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1982 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.11.1982 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 02.02.1983 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1983 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1983 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.1984 | No opposition filed within time limit [1984/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 29.02.1984 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | FR2300542 [ ] (HOWSE & CO LTD D [GB]) | Examination | FR1122634 | US3053251 | GB1522497 | US4224698 |