EP0036787 - Liquid jet printing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.06.1986 [1986/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMBRIDGE CONSULTANTS LIMITED Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/39] | For all designated states CAMBRIDGE CONSULTANTS LIMITED Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 4DW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lewis, John Didwith 26 Girton Road Cambridge / GB | 02 /
Keeling, Michael Richard 15 Rampton Road Willingham, Cambridge / GB | 03 /
Bowen, David Richard 14 Otter Close Bar Hill, Cambridge / GB | 04 /
Paton, Anthony David 51 Mills Lane Long Stanton St. Michael Cambridge / GB | [1981/39] | Representative(s) | Coleman, Stanley, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | [1981/39] | Application number, filing date | 81301317.4 | 26.03.1981 | [1981/39] | Priority number, date | GB19800010105 | 26.03.1980 Original published format: GB 8010105 | [1981/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0036787 | Date: | 30.09.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0036787 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | B41J3/04 | [1981/39] | CPC: |
B41J2/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1981/39] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsstrahldrucker | [1981/39] | English: | Liquid jet printing apparatus | [1981/39] | French: | Imprimante à jet de liquide | [1981/39] | Examination procedure | 25.03.1982 | Examination requested [1982/23] | 21.03.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.03.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 01.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US4060813 [ ] (YAMADA TAKAHIRO, et al) | [ ] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Vol. 21, No. 5, October 1978 New York J.T. WELCH "Ink Sensor Contamination Avoidance" pages 1945 to 1946 * page 1945; fig. 1 * | Examination | DE2759067 | DE2611282 | US3769630 | EP0015727 | US3886564 |