EP0039152 - Editing apparatus for recorded signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 09.09.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/48] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
Former [1981/44] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa-6 Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Menezes, William A. 2478 Alvin Street Mountain View California 94043 / US | 02 /
Kuper, Douglas D. 55 Christopher Avenue Campbell California 95008 / US | [1981/44] | Representative(s) | Haigh, Charles Roy, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1981/44] | Haigh, Charles Roy, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 81301518.7 | 07.04.1981 | [1981/44] | Priority number, date | US19800139747 | 11.04.1980 Original published format: US 139747 | [1981/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0039152 | Date: | 04.11.1981 | Language: | EN | [1981/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0039152 | Date: | 09.01.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/02] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0039152 | Date: | 25.10.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1981 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/86, H04N5/78 | [1981/44] | CPC: |
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B27/028 (EP,US);
G11B2220/90 (EP,US);
G11B27/024 (EP,US);
G11B27/36 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, NL [1981/44] | Title | German: | Bandschnitteinrichtung für Signalaufzeichnungen | [1981/44] | English: | Editing apparatus for recorded signals | [1981/44] | French: | Dispositif de montage pour enregistrements de signaux | [1981/44] | Examination procedure | 08.04.1982 | Examination requested [1982/24] | 14.01.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.1983 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.04.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 29.06.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.09.1984 | Fee for grant paid | 10.09.1984 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
09.10.1985
22.10.1985
ADMISSIBLE AEG Aktiengesellschaft Berlin und Frankfurt PTL D-60591 Frankfurt / DE | [1985/51] | 14.11.1985 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.05.1986 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.06.1986 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1986 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 22.01.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 12.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1987 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.02.1989 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 06.03.1989 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 26.05.1989 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.08.1989 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | |||
Former [1990/42] | AT | 09.01.1985 | Documents cited: | Search | DE2205893 [ ] (COLUMBIA BROADCASTING SYST INC); | DE2702780 [ ] (SONY CORP); | DE2837111 [ ] (SONY CORP); | DE2848062 [ ] (SONY CORP) |