|
14.03.1991 |
Transmission of the new certificate for a European patent pursuant to 87 EPC in conjunction with Rule 74 EPC |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1991 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.1991 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1991 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1991 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.1990 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.1990 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1990 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.1990 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1990 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.06.1990 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.1990 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.1990 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.12.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1989 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1989 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1989 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.11.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
24 |
|
07.11.1989 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.11.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.10.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
04.10.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.06.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.06.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.05.1989 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.1989 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.1989 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.05.1989 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1989 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1989 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1989 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.04.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.1989 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1989 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1989 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1989 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.04.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.04.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.1989 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.1988 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.10.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.10.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
04.10.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.09.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.1988 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.05.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
29.03.1988 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1988 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1988 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.1988 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1988 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.02.1988 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.02.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1988 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1988 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1988 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1988 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
22.01.1988 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1988 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1987 |
Annex |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1987 |
Annex |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.11.1987 |
Annex |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.11.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.10.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1987 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.10.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.09.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.09.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.08.1987 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.08.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.08.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1987 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1987 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.08.1987 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1987 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1987 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.08.1987 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1987 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.07.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.1987 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1987 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.1986 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.09.1986 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.1986 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.1986 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.08.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.08.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.08.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.08.1986 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.08.1986 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1986 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.07.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1986 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.1986 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.03.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
19 |
|
18.03.1986 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.1986 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.01.1986 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.08.1985 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.08.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.1985 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.07.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1985 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1985 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1985 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.1985 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.1985 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1985 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.05.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1985 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.04.1985 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.1985 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1985 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.08.1984 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.06.1984 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1984 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.1984 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1984 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1984 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1984 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.04.1984 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1984 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.03.1984 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.03.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1984 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.1984 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1984 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.01.1984 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.1983 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1983 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.1983 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.10.1983 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
06.09.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.1983 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
25.05.1983 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.03.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.03.1983 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.1983 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.11.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1982 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1981 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.1981 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1981 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1981 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of designation fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1981 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1981 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.1981 |
Invitation to pay filing fee/search fee with additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1981 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
28.04.1981 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
16.04.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1981 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.1981 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.1981 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.04.1981 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |