EP0044654 - Fuel tank closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1983 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
IT
SE
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1982/36] | For:GB
IT
SE
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
Former [1982/23] | For:GB
IT
SE
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | |||
Former [1982/04] | For:GB
IT
SE
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Ottoplatz 2 Postfach 210369 D-5000 Köln 21 / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE SOCIETE ANONYME 344 Avenue Napoléon Bonaparte B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil Malmaison Cedex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellis, Peter Joseph 26 Drake Close Thundersley Benfleet Essex / GB | 02 /
Maguire, Philip Macarten 32 Brendon Laindon Basildon Essex / GB | 03 /
Ewers, Peter G. 6 Poplar Close South Woodham Ferrers Essex / GB | [1982/04] | Representative(s) | Drakeford, Robert William, et al Ford Motor Company Limited 15/448, Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/04] | Drakeford, Robert William, et al Ford Motor Company Limited 15/448, Research & Engineering Centre Laindon Basildon Essex SS15 6EE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81303073.1 | 06.07.1981 | [1982/04] | Priority number, date | GB19800023563 | 18.07.1980 Original published format: GB 8023563 | [1982/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0044654 | Date: | 27.01.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0044654 | Date: | 08.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1982 | Classification | IPC: | B60K15/04, B65D51/00, B65D51/24 | [1982/04] | CPC: |
B60K15/0406 (EP);
B60K15/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1982/04] | Title | German: | Tankverschluss | [1982/04] | English: | Fuel tank closure | [1982/04] | French: | Bouchon de réservoir à carburant | [1982/04] | File destroyed: | 18.06.1989 | Examination procedure | 03.06.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1983/46] | 15.08.1983 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1983/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.03.1983 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1983 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4034337 ; | [A]US3915491 ; | [A]US2004872 ; | [A]US4010967 ; | [A]US2407439 |