|
17.05.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1991 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1990 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.07.1990 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
25.06.1990 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1990 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.1990 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
25.06.1990 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1990 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.1990 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.11.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.05.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
13.02.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.1988 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
10.11.1988 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.10.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1988 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.1988 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.1988 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1988 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.12.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.1987 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1987 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.09.1987 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.05.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.05.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.04.1987 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.04.1987 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.1987 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.1987 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.1987 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.10.1986 |
Claims |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.10.1986 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.09.1986 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.07.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1985 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.12.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.12.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.04.1985 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.1984 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.09.1984 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1984 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
26.04.1984 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.06.1983 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.1983 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.1983 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1982 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.1982 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1982 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.09.1982 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1982 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.1982 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.1982 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.1982 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1982 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied within the opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1982 |
Communication to applicant regarding observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.1982 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
10.08.1982 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
11.06.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1982 |
Communication of transfer of rights/change of name of applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.1982 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.05.1982 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.12.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1981 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1981 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.1981 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
18.08.1981 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
18.08.1981 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
17.08.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.08.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1981 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.1981 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.08.1981 |
Request for correction |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.1981 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.07.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
67 |
|
16.07.1981 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.1981 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |