|
13.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended opponent data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.12.2000 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.1991 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.07.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
21.03.1991 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.03.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.03.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
22.02.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.12.1990 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1990 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1990 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1990 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.12.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1990 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.11.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.09.1990 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.08.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
31.08.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.06.1990 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.1990 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.1990 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.05.1990 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1990 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.01.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1990 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.11.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.1989 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.1989 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1989 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1989 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.04.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.04.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.03.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.03.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1988 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.02.1988 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1988 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1988 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.1988 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.01.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.1988 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.1988 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.1988 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.01.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1987 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1987 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1987 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
08.05.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.05.1987 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.05.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
02.05.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.11.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1986 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
14.11.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.11.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.11.1986 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
14.08.1986 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.1986 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.07.1986 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1986 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1986 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.02.1986 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.1986 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.01.1986 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1985 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.1985 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.1985 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
31.07.1985 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.1984 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.1984 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.05.1984 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1984 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.1984 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.1983 |
Request for assignment |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.08.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.08.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.1983 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.1983 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.04.1982 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.1982 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1982 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1982 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1982 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.1981 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1981 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.10.1981 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.1981 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
07.10.1981 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
06.10.1981 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.1981 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1981 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |