EP0050947 - Improvements in high pressure gas cylinders [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1985 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCAN ALUMINIUM (UK) LIMITED Alcan House 30 Berkeley Square London W1 / GB | For all designated states Cadbury Schweppes Limited 1-4 Connaught Place London, W2 2EX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/18] | For all designated states ALCAN ALUMINIUM (UK) LIMITED Alcan House 30 Berkeley Square London W1 / GB | ||
For all designated states Cadbury Schweppes Limited 1-4 Connaught Place London, W2 2EX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hawkins, John Fletcher 3 Edmonton Way Oakham Leicestershire / GB | 02 /
Jeans, Edward Lewis Saint Michaels South Parade Ledbury Hereford / GB | [1982/18] | Representative(s) | Hewlett, Arthur James, et al STEVENS, HEWLETT & PERKINS 5 Quality Court Chancery Lane London WC2A 1HZ / GB | [1982/18] | Application number, filing date | 81304840.2 | 16.10.1981 | [1982/18] | Priority number, date | US19800200022 | 23.10.1980 Original published format: US 200022 | [1982/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0050947 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0050947 | Date: | 01.09.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1982 | Classification | IPC: | F17C1/14, F17C13/00, F17C1/00 | [1982/30] | CPC: |
F17C13/04 (EP);
F17C1/14 (EP);
F17C2201/0109 (EP);
F17C2203/0639 (EP);
F17C2203/0646 (EP);
F17C2205/0329 (EP);
F17C2205/0332 (EP);
F17C2205/0335 (EP);
F17C2205/0385 (EP);
F17C2205/0394 (EP);
F17C2209/2181 (EP);
F17C2221/035 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1982/18] | F17C1/14, F17C13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1982/18] | Title | German: | Hochdruckgasflaschen | [1982/18] | English: | Improvements in high pressure gas cylinders | [1982/18] | French: | Bonbonnes à gaz à haute pression | [1982/18] | File destroyed: | 02.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 23.02.1983 | Examination requested [1983/19] | 24.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.02.1985 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1985/33] | 07.03.1985 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1985/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1984 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4033378 (PAULIUKONIS RICHARD S); | [A]FR884987 (SAGEM); | [A]DE555447 (DRAEGERWERK AG, et al); | [A]DE842799 (HEIZBAU G M B H GEBR REUSCH); | [A]US3024936 (LOGUE JR CLYDE C) |