EP0050967 - Signal detection system for use in an optically operating reproducing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1982/18] | Signal detection system for use in an optically reproducing apparatus | ||
[1985/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1986 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.06.1986 [1986/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Optical Co., Ltd. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1982/18] | For all designated states OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO., LTD. 43-2, 2-chome, Hatagaya Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shibata, Tsutomu No. 22-13, 4-Chome Ohwada-Machi Hachioji City Tokyo / JP | [1982/18] | Representative(s) | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/18] | Fane, Christopher Robin King, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 81304999.6 | 23.10.1981 | [1982/18] | Priority number, date | JP19800149565 | 25.10.1980 Original published format: JP 14956580 | [1982/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0050967 | Date: | 05.05.1982 | Language: | EN | [1982/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0050967 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G11B7/08, G11B7/12, G02B7/11, // G02B5/08 | [1982/18] | CPC: |
G11B7/0906 (EP,US);
G11B7/08 (KR);
G11B7/0908 (EP,US);
G11B7/095 (EP,US);
G11B7/12 (EP,US);
G11B7/1359 (EP,US);
G11B2007/0919 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1982/30] |
Former [1982/18] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Signalerkennungssystem für ein optisches Wiedergabegerät | [1985/26] | English: | Signal detection system for use in an optically operating reproducing apparatus | [1985/26] | French: | Système de détection d'informations pour appareil de lecture optique | [1985/26] |
Former [1982/18] | Datendetektionsverfahren für ein optisches Wiedergabegerät | ||
Former [1982/18] | Signal detection system for use in an optically reproducing apparatus | ||
Former [1982/18] | Système de détection d'information pour un appareil de lecture optique | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 18.02.1982 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, IT, LI, LU, SE | 29.04.1982 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.10.1982 | Examination requested [1983/01] | 07.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.04.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.11.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.1983 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.11.1981 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 23.11.1981 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 23.11.1981 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 23.11.1981 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 23.11.1981 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 23.11.1981 | SE   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP5329701 [ ]; | JP5661045 [ ]; | JPS5293223 [ ] (PHILIPS NV); | US4051527 [ ] (BRAAT JOSEPHUS JOHANNES MARIA); | DE3023779 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | JPS5329701 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | JPS5661045 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | NL8003659 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | FR2459991 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO [JP]); | FR2339929 [ ] (PHILIPS NV [NL]); | US4057833 [ ] (BRAAT JOSEPHUS JOHANNES MARIA); | EP0011990 [ ] (DISCOVISION ASS [US]); | GB2057218 [ ] (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | US4180822 [ ] (HERZOG DONALD G [US], et al) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 2, No. 64, May 17, 1978 page 2100 E 78 & JP-A-53 29701 (Olympus Kogaku Kogyo K.K.) (20-03-1978) * Complete Abstract *, & JP5329701 A 00000000 | [ ] - Laser + Elektro Optik, Vol 13, June 1981 No. 2 Stuttgart, DE "Olympus launches into the Video Disc Market with a new Optical Video Disc Pickup System "Taohs" on an OEM basis", pages 38, 39. * Complete * | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Vol. 5, No. 122, (P-74/ (794) August 7, 1981 & JP-A-56 61045 (Olympus Kogaku Kogyo K.K.) * Complete Abstract *, & JP5661045 A 00000000 | [ ] - Eosd Electro-Optical Systems Design, Vol. 12, No. 6, June 1980, Chicago, US "Two-Action Optical Head System Developed", page 28 |