|
20.12.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.1991 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.1991 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.09.1991 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.04.1991 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.01.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.12.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1990 |
Decision to discontinue the opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.10.1990 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.1990 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1990 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1990 |
Communication concerning statement of surrender/lapse of patent/failure to reply to a notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.08.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.08.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.07.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.1990 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
17.11.1989 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.08.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1989 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.1989 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.07.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.05.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.01.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.01.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
22.11.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.1988 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.12.1987 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1987 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1987 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1987 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.1987 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.07.1987 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.05.1987 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.1987 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.02.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
03.12.1986 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.10.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.07.1985 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.1985 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.01.1985 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.1984 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.09.1984 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1984 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.06.1983 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.04.1983 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1982 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1982 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.1981 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |