|
03.12.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.07.1989 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.1989 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.10.1988 |
Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.09.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.09.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
06.09.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.1988 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1988 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
28.01.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
39 |
|
28.01.1988 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
28.01.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.01.1988 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.1988 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.1988 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.1987 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.11.1987 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.09.1987 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1987 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.1987 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.08.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.02.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.1987 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.11.1986 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.1986 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.11.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.07.1986 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1985 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.12.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.12.1985 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.12.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.07.1985 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.1985 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.04.1985 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.04.1985 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.02.1985 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.11.1984 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.1984 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
18.10.1984 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.05.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
28.05.1984 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.1984 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1984 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.01.1984 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.1983 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.1982 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1982 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.04.1982 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1982 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
13.04.1982 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.04.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
13.04.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
13.04.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
13.04.1982 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
13.04.1982 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
13.04.1982 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
13.04.1982 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
08.01.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.01.1982 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1981 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1981 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.12.1981 |
Description |
Search / examination |
54 |
|
17.12.1981 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1981 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.1981 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.12.1981 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.1981 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
80 |
|
17.12.1981 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |