EP0045807 - ALUMINUM CAN WITH COLLAPSIBLE SIDEWALL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.09.1984 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.11.1984 [1984/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BELOKIN, Paul Jr. Rt. 4 Hayward, WI 54843 / US | [1982/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1982/07] | Representative(s) | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. Thornton & CO. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1982/07] | Allden, Thomas Stanley, et al A.A. THORNTON & CO. Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 81900782.4 | 24.02.1981 | [1982/07] | WO1981US00224 | Priority number, date | US19800123990 | 25.02.1980 Original published format: US 123990 | [1982/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO8102415 | Date: | 03.09.1981 | [1981/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0045807 | Date: | 17.02.1982 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1981 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1982/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.02.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65D8/08, B65D8/12, B65D8/14 | [1982/07] | CPC: |
B65D1/165 (EP,US);
Y02W30/80 (EP,US);
Y10S215/90 (EP,US);
Y10S220/906 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1982/07] | Title | German: | ALUMINIUMDOSE MIT DEFORMIERBAREN SEITENWÄNDEN | [1982/07] | English: | ALUMINUM CAN WITH COLLAPSIBLE SIDEWALL | [1982/07] | French: | BOITE EN ALUMINIUM AVEC PAROIS LATERALES DEFORMABLES | [1982/07] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Entry into regional phase | 10.10.1981 | National basic fee paid | 10.10.1981 | Search fee paid | 10.10.1981 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.10.1981 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.10.1981 | Examination requested [1982/07] | 21.12.1983 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.05.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/46] | 01.06.1984 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1984/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1982 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1984 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | US3845880 [ ] (COLE M) | International search | [X]US1617857 (MALLORY HARRY C); | [X]US3353700 (KALINA BEN F); | [X]US3401826 (ANTHONY MYRON L) |