|
05.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the opponent (Association) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.1998 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1998 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.1997 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.12.1997 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.12.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.1997 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
17.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.09.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.09.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.1997 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1997 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.09.1997 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.1997 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1997 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.08.1997 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.1997 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.03.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
06.11.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.1995 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.1995 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
17.10.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1995 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1995 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.1995 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
07.09.1995 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.07.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.07.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.07.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.1995 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.07.1995 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.07.1995 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.1995 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
9 |
|
14.07.1995 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1995 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
17.05.1995 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.1995 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.1995 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.02.1995 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.1995 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.12.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.1994 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1994 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.12.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1994 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.1994 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.1994 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1994 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.09.1994 |
Withdrawal of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.08.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.05.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1994 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.1994 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.03.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.11.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1993 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.08.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.06.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1993 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.06.1993 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.05.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.03.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.03.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.08.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.08.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1991 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.05.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.1991 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.1991 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.1991 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.1991 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.1991 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.1991 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
10.04.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.1991 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1990 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.09.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.09.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.07.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.07.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
13 |
|
13.07.1990 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.1990 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.06.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.06.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.06.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.06.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.06.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.06.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.06.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.05.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.05.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.05.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.1990 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.04.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.1990 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.1990 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.12.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
11.11.1989 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.11.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.10.1989 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.09.1989 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.04.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.1989 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.03.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
27.02.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.1989 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.02.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.02.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.02.1989 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.02.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.02.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.01.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.01.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.12.1988 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Brief communication with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.11.1988 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.11.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.11.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.04.1988 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.1987 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.11.1987 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.09.1987 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1987 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.09.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
09.06.1987 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.01.1987 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.1987 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1986 |
Adjournment of examination/opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.1986 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.1986 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.1986 |
Reply to communication to third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.11.1985 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.1985 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1985 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.1985 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.09.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.01.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.01.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.12.1984 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.1984 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1984 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.1984 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.1984 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.1984 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.1984 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.05.1984 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
12.04.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.04.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.04.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.04.1984 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.01.1984 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.1983 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1983 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.08.1983 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.1982 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.08.1982 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.1982 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.1982 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.02.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.02.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.02.1982 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.02.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.02.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |