|
24.06.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1993 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.12.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.11.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
23.11.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
10 |
|
20.08.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.07.1993 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.07.1993 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.07.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1993 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1993 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.07.1993 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1993 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.1993 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.05.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1993 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.04.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.07.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.07.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
11.05.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.05.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.04.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.04.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.04.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.03.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.03.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.03.1992 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.03.1992 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
14 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.1992 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.02.1992 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.12.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.09.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.1991 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1991 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.09.1991 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.09.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.07.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.1991 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
14.03.1991 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.03.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
5 |
|
01.06.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.05.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.03.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1989 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1989 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.1989 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.06.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1989 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
09.12.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.12.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
10.08.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.08.1988 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.03.1988 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.01.1988 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1987 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.1987 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.1987 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.1987 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.07.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.07.1987 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.06.1987 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.1987 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.1987 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.1987 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.1987 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
04.02.1987 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.12.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.12.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.09.1986 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.08.1986 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1986 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.1986 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.04.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.10.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.06.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.1983 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.1983 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1983 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.1983 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.1982 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1982 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1982 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.1982 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
12.05.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |