EP0067421 - Floor transportation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.08.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 01.10.2008 [2008/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FREDENHAGEN KG Sprendlinger Landstrasse 181 D-63069 Offenbach / DE | [1982/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kupczyk, Werner Lerchesbergring 112 D-6000 Frankfurt/Main 70 / DE | [1982/51] | Representative(s) | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, et al Patentanwalt Postfach 21 44 63411 Hanau / DE | ||
Former [1982/51] | Stoffregen, Hans-Herbert, Dr. Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Strasse & Stoffregen Salzstrasse 11a Postfach 2144 D-63411 Hanau / DE | Application number, filing date | 82105083.8 | 11.06.1982 | [1982/51] | Priority number, date | DE19813123638 | 15.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3123638 | DE19813123706 | 15.06.1981 Original published format: DE 3123706 | [1982/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0067421 | Date: | 22.12.1982 | Language: | DE | [1982/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0067421 | Date: | 31.08.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0067421 | Date: | 26.02.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/09] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0067421 | Date: | 02.10.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65G19/02, B65G37/00, B65G35/06 | [1983/35] | CPC: |
B65G37/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1982/51] | B65G19/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1982/51] | Title | German: | Bodenfördersystem | [1982/51] | English: | Floor transportation system | [1982/51] | French: | Système de transport à surface porteuse | [1982/51] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/38] | 13.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.06.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1986
12.12.1986
ADMISSIBLE Mannesmann Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer2 Postfach 5501 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE Opponent's representative Meissner, Peter E., et al, et al Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | 02
24.11.1986
12.12.1986
ADMISSIBLE Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Dallhammer, Herbert Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung 64273 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1986
12.12.1986
ADMISSIBLE Mannesmann Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer2 Postfach 5501 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE Opponent's representative Meissner, Peter E., et al, et al Meissner & Meissner, Patentanwaltsbüro, Postfach 33 01 30 14171 Berlin / DE | ||
02
24.11.1986
12.12.1986
ADMISSIBLE Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Dallhammer, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | |||
Former [1988/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1986
12.12.1986
ADMISSIBLE Mannesmann Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer2 Postfach 5501 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE Opponent's representative Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro, et al, et al Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | ||
02
24.11.1986
12.12.1986
ADMISSIBLE Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Dallhammer, Herbert, Dipl.-Ing. Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE | |||
Former [1987/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1986
Mannesmann Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer2 Postfach 5501 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE Opponent's representative Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro, et al, et al Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | ||
02
24.11.1986
Carl Schenck AG Patentabteilung D-64273 Darmstadt / DE Opponent's representative Dallhammer, Herbert Schlossstrasse 62 D-6104 Seeheim-1 / DE | |||
Former [1986/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.11.1986
Mannesmann Aktiengesellschaft Mannesmannufer2 Postfach 5501 D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE Opponent's representative Meissner, Peter E., Dipl.-Ing. Meissner & Meissner Patentanwaltsbüro, et al, et al Postfach D-14199 Berlin / DE | 03.02.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 10.06.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.07.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 21.09.1987 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 29.04.1988 | Date of oral proceedings | 13.06.1988 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 16.12.1988 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 24.11.1990 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.02.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 23.05.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 03.02.1989 | Appeal received No. T0097/89 | 19.04.1989 | Statement of grounds filed | 13.07.1990 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1990/28] | 20.09.1990 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1990/38] | 14.11.1990 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP5548114 [ ] | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, M Field, Vol. 4, No. 92, 3. Juli 1980 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT Seite 9 M 18 & JP-A-55-48 114 (mitsubishi ) fig., & JP5548114 A 00000000 |