|
12.08.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.1990 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1990 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.07.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
22 |
|
19.07.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
16.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.07.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.04.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.01.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.09.1989 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.1989 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.1989 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1989 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.1989 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.08.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1989 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1989 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.07.1989 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.1989 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
01.07.1989 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
01.07.1989 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
01.07.1989 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
16.05.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.1989 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1989 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1989 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1989 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1989 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
18.04.1989 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.1989 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.1989 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.01.1989 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.1989 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1988 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.09.1988 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.07.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.07.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.04.1988 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1988 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.01.1988 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.01.1988 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1987 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1987 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.04.1987 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.02.1987 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1987 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.1987 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.1986 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.12.1986 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.1986 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.1986 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.1986 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.07.1986 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
20.06.1986 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
06.05.1986 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.1986 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.02.1986 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
15.01.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
15.01.1986 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.11.1985 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.1985 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.07.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
18.07.1985 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.1985 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.03.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
26.03.1985 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
19.06.1984 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.1984 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1983 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.07.1983 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1983 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1982 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1982 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.08.1982 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.1982 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.1982 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.1982 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.1982 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.1982 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.07.1982 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.07.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
41 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
30.06.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |