EP0074013 - Cation emission type halogenated hydrocarbon gas detecting element [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.09.1986 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.1986 [1986/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 210-8572 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/42] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1984/36] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210 / JP | ||
Former [1983/11] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA TOSHIBA 72, Horikawa-cho, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken 210, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Katsura, Masaki 4-17-9, Iwato Yokosuka-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Harata, Mituo 4-403, Suge jutaku 3484-10 Suge Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Takikawa, Osamu 501, Kamakura-Haitsu 3-6-15, Dai Kamakura-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Shiratori, Masayuki Daini-seritaso 896, Suenaga Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1983/11] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 82107746.8 | 24.08.1982 | [1983/11] | Priority number, date | JP19810135414 | 31.08.1981 Original published format: JP 13541481 | [1983/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0074013 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0074013 | Date: | 21.11.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/62, G01N33/00, G01N27/56 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
G01N27/626 (EP,KR,US);
G01N33/0036 (KR);
Y10T436/196666 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1983/11] | Title | German: | Detektorelement für Kationenemissionen des Typs Halogenkohlenwasserstoffgas | [1983/11] | English: | Cation emission type halogenated hydrocarbon gas detecting element | [1983/11] | French: | Elément détecteur d'émission de cation de type gaz hydrocarbure halogéné | [1983/11] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 01.08.1983 | Examination requested [1983/41] | 16.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.04.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.08.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE7516931U ; | [Y]FR2215138 (UNITED KINGDOM GOVERNMENT [GB]); | [Y]US4166009 (FRAY DEREK J [GB]); | [Y]FR2426905 (AUERGESELLSCHAFT GMBH [DE]); | [YP]GB1603496 (ATOMIC ENERGY AUTHORITY UK) |