EP0103032 - Semiconductor optocoupler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1984/12] | Optocoupler with improved light transmissivity | ||
[1988/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1988 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [1984/12] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady New York 12305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cook, James Stone Sky High Road, R.D. No. 2 Tully New York 12159 / US | 02 /
Lennon, James Anthony 19 the Glen Dublin Road Newry Down Northern Ireland / GB | [1984/12] | Representative(s) | Grupe, Peter, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/03] | Grupe, Peter, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne-Grupe-Pellmann-Grams-Struif Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/12] | Voigt, Reinhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elsterweg 22 D-65812 Bad Soden / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108309.4 | 09.09.1982 | [1984/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0103032 | Date: | 21.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0103032 | Date: | 02.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/16 | [1984/12] | CPC: |
H01L31/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1984/12] | Title | German: | Halbleiter-optokoppler | [1988/09] | English: | Semiconductor optocoupler | [1988/09] | French: | Photocoupleur à semiconducteur | [1988/09] |
Former [1984/12] | Optokoppler mit verbesserter Lichtdurchlässigkeit | ||
Former [1984/12] | Optocoupler with improved light transmissivity | ||
Former [1984/12] | Photocoupleur à transmissibilité améliorée de la lumière | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 11.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/47] | 23.10.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.05.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.09.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 03.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.12.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.09.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2606524 ; | [X]FR2272377 ; | [X]FR2262407 ; | [Y]FR2339959 ; | [A]DE2304148 ; | [A]DE2950649 ; | [A]FR2176103 |