EP0075260 - Spectacles with safety strap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.05.1986 [1986/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Eugen Beck KG Am Mackenberg D-4740 Oelde 1 / DE | [1983/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Beck, Rainer, Dipl.-Ing. Am Mackenberg D-4740 Oelde 1 / DE | 02 /
Schulte, Alfons Am Wiesenborn 2 D-4720 Beckum / DE | [1983/13] | Representative(s) | Meldau, Gustav, et al Vennstrasse 9 D-4830 Gütersloh 1 / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/13] | Meldau, Gustav, Dipl.-Ing., et al Vennstrasse 9 D-4830 Gütersloh 1 / DE | Application number, filing date | 82108484.5 | 15.09.1982 | [1983/13] | Priority number, date | DE19810027522U | 19.09.1981 Original published format: DE 8127522 U | DE19820003188U | 06.02.1982 Original published format: DE 8203188 U | [1983/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0075260 | Date: | 30.03.1983 | Language: | DE | [1983/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0075260 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | DE | [1985/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1982 | Classification | IPC: | G02C3/00 | [1983/13] | CPC: |
G02C11/00 (EP,US);
G02C3/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/13] | Title | German: | Brillengestell mit Sicherungsband | [1983/13] | English: | Spectacles with safety strap | [1983/13] | French: | Monture de lunettes avec un cordon de sécurité | [1983/13] | Examination procedure | 18.03.1983 | Examination requested [1983/21] | 03.02.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.06.1984 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.10.1984 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.01.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 17.01.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.02.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3728012 (DOWNEY D); | [A]DE2118358 ; | [A]FR1080633 ; | [A]US2798409 (REGINALD SPEERS) |