EP0078978 - Bobbin holder [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1987 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1987 [1987/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIJIN SEIKI CO. Ltd. Higobashi Center Building, 9-1, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka 550-0002 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | For all designated states TEIJIN SEIKI CO. Ltd. Higobashi Center Building 9-1, Edobori 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka 550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyake, Yuzuru 108-4, Kubota-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | 02 /
Sugioka, Takami 1072, Itasaya-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | 03 /
Murakami, Shoichi 3-20, Yodonishi 4-chome Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken 790 / JP | 04 /
Ibuki, Hideaki 2750-1, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | [1986/10] |
Former [1983/22] | 01 /
Miyake, Yuzuru 108-4, Kubota-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Sugioka, Takami 1072, Itasaya-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Murakami, Shoichi 3-20, Yodonishi 4-chome Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Ibuki, Hideaki 2750-1, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | |||
Former [1983/20] | 01 /
Miyake, Yuzuru 108-4, Kubota-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Sugioka, Takami 1072, Itasaya-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | |||
03 /
Murakami, Shoichi 2750-1, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | |||
04 /
Ibuki, Hideaki 2750-1, Minamiyoshida-cho Matsuyama-shi Ehime-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Uhlandstrasse 14c 70182 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/20] | Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Uhlandstrasse 14 c D-70182 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 82109908.2 | 27.10.1982 | [1983/20] | Priority number, date | JP19810161143U | 30.10.1981 Original published format: JP 16114381 U | [1983/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0078978 | Date: | 18.05.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0078978 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | B65H54/54 | [1983/20] | CPC: |
B65H75/2455 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, IT, LI [1983/20] | Title | German: | Spulenhalter | [1983/20] | English: | Bobbin holder | [1983/20] | French: | Châssis de bobines | [1983/20] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1983 | Examination requested [1983/40] | 21.09.1984 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 28.08.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 11.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1016675 (I C P M IND CHIMICHE PORTO MAR); | [X]CH443993 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]); | [X]CH443994 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]); | [X]GB1152961 (SYNCRO MACH CO [US]) |