blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0083750

EP0083750 - Antimycotic azolyl butanols [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.1986
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.1986No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.07.1986 [1986/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BAYER AG
51368 Leverkusen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1983/29]For all designated states
BAYER AG
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Krämer, Wolfgang, Dr.
Am Eckbusch 39/45
D-5600 Wuppertal / DE
02 / Büchel, Karl Heinz, Prof.Dr.
Dabringhausener Strasse 42
D-5093 Burcheid / DE
03 / Elbe, Hans-Ludwig, Dr.
Dasnoeckel 59
D-5600 Wuppertal 11 / DE
04 / Kraatz, Udo, Dr.
Andreasstrasse 22a
D-5090 Leverkusen / DE
05 / Regel, Erik, Ing.-grad.
Untere Bergerheide 26
D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE
06 / Plempel, Manfred, Dr.
Zwengenberger Strasse 3c
D-5657 Haan / DE
07 / Schaller, Klaus, Dr.
Bergerheide 47
D-5600 Wuppertal 1 / DE
[1983/29]
Application number, filing date82111535.913.12.1982
[1983/29]
Priority number, dateDE1981315144024.12.1981         Original published format: DE 3151440
[1983/29]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0083750
Date:20.07.1983
Language:DE
[1983/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0083750
Date:07.08.1985
Language:DE
[1985/32]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.04.1983
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/41, A61K31/415, // C07D249/08, C07D233/60, C07D233/54
[1983/29]
CPC:
C07D231/12 (EP); A61K31/41 (EP); A61K31/415 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP); C07D233/56 (EP); C07D249/08 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1983/29]
TitleGerman:Antimykotische Azolyl-butanole[1983/29]
English:Antimycotic azolyl butanols[1983/29]
French:Azolyl butanols antimycosiques[1983/29]
Examination procedure13.12.1982Examination requested  [1983/29]
25.04.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.06.1984Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
29.06.1984Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.1984Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: )
17.01.1985Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.01.1985Fee for grant paid
24.01.1985Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)08.05.1986No opposition filed within time limit [1986/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.1984Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0020955  (BAYER AG [DE]);
 [XPD]EP0055833  (BAYER AG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.