EP0068591 - Novel sulfonamide derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.1986 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY 301 East Sixth Street Cincinnati Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Buckwalter, Brian Lee 102 Ovington Drive Yardley Pennsylvania 19067 / US | 02 /
Lahann, Thomas Robert 9239 Harrison Pike Cleves Ohio 45002 / US | [1983/01] | Representative(s) | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/01] | Suslic, Lydia, et al Procter & Gamble European Technical Center N.V. Temselaan 100 B-1853 Strombeek-Bever / BE | Application number, filing date | 82200797.7 | 28.06.1982 | [1983/01] | Priority number, date | US19810279092 | 30.06.1981 Original published format: US 279092 | US19820360953 | 23.03.1982 Original published format: US 360953 | [1983/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0068591 | Date: | 05.01.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0068591 | Date: | 14.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0068591 | Date: | 25.09.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C07C143/822, C07C143/75, C07C143/79, A61K7/155, A61K31/18 | [1984/11] | CPC: |
A61Q9/04 (EP,US);
A61K8/46 (EP,US);
A61K8/466 (EP,US);
A61Q17/00 (EP,US);
A61K2800/75 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1984/11] | C07C143/822, A61K31/18, A61K7/155 | ||
Former IPC [1983/01] | C07C143/75, A61K31/18, A61K7/155 | Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1983/01] | Title | German: | Sulfonamid-Derivate | [1983/01] | English: | Novel sulfonamide derivatives | [1983/01] | French: | Dérivés de sulfonamide | [1983/01] | Examination procedure | 25.08.1984 | Examination requested [1984/44] | 27.11.1984 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.02.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1986/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.06.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56026865 ; | [AP]EP0031954 (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE]) | [A] - Patent Abstracts of Japan vol. 5, no. 79, 23 May 1981 & JP-A-56 026 865, & JP56026865 A 19810523 |