|
14.03.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Communication to the parties concerning termination of the opposition proceedings - opposition rejected - no appeal lodged |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.2002 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.09.2002 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.06.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.2002 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2002 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.05.2002 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.04.2002 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.03.2002 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.02.2002 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.02.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
70 |
|
15.02.2002 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
174 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
8 |
|
12.02.2002 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
08.02.2002 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
21 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
06.02.2002 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2001 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2001 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.06.2001 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.05.2001 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.11.2000 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.07.2000 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.07.2000 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.04.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.2000 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2000 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.1999 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.1999 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.1999 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
18 |
|
28.09.1999 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.09.1999 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1999 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1999 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.09.1999 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.08.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.07.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1999 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.1999 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.1999 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.1999 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.06.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1999 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.05.1999 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.05.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.05.1999 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.05.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.1999 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.1999 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.03.1999 |
Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Notification of decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Notification of decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Notification of decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.1999 |
Notification of decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.1999 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
36 |
|
02.11.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.11.1998 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1998 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.09.1998 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1998 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1998 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1998 |
F3090 FAX Boards of Appeal (general) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.1998 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.08.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.08.1998 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
07.08.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
05.08.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
05.08.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1998 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1998 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.1998 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.1998 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.05.1998 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.03.1998 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1998 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1998 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.12.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.1997 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.1997 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.1997 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
29 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.11.1997 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.08.1997 |
Forwarding of documents to other party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.08.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1997 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.08.1997 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1997 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.1997 |
Letter Enlarged Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.1997 |
Composition of the board |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.1997 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.1997 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1996 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
24 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
24 |
|
02.07.1996 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.06.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1996 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.06.1996 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.1996 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.06.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1996 |
Letter Boards of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1996 |
Letter Boards of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1996 |
Letter Boards of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
21 |
|
24.05.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1996 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.1996 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.05.1996 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
24.05.1996 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.05.1996 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.05.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1996 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.04.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.1996 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.04.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.1996 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.04.1996 |
Oral proceedings: Annex to summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.04.1996 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1996 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.1996 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.1996 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.1996 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.1995 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
09.02.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.1995 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.02.1995 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.01.1995 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.05.1994 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.04.1994 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.1994 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
56 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.01.1994 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
34 |
|
24.05.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
12.05.1993 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
10.05.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
29.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.03.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.1993 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1993 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
27 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
50 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
34 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
31 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
50 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
44 |
|
18.09.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
77 |
|
07.08.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.08.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.07.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.04.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.04.1992 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
16 |
|
06.02.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1992 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.01.1992 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.01.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.01.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.1992 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.01.1992 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1991 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.1991 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
7 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.12.1991 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
19 |
|
16.10.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.10.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.10.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.10.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1991 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.07.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
7 |
|
24.06.1991 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.06.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.05.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.04.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.04.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
11.04.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1991 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.1991 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
15 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
6 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
21 |
|
03.12.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.11.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.11.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.1990 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
09.05.1990 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.1990 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.05.1990 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.04.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.04.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.04.1990 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.04.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1990 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1990 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.1990 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1990 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1990 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1990 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
16.02.1990 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.02.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.02.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
13.02.1990 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.08.1989 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.1989 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.04.1989 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1989 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.1989 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.1988 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.08.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.08.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
20.07.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.03.1988 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.02.1988 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.1987 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.06.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.06.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.06.1987 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.03.1987 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1987 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.1986 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.06.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.06.1986 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.05.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.04.1986 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (request for further processing without effect) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.03.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.1985 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.1984 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.1984 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.1984 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.1984 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.03.1984 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.01.1983 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.1982 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.1982 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
25.08.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.08.1982 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.08.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
25.08.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |