EP0080271 - Indomethacin phenyl ester derivatives, their use, and compositions containing them [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.01.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEIKOKU KAGAKU SANGYO K.K. 1-18, Kitahorie 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | For all designated states TEIKOKU KAGAKU SANGYO K.K. 1-18, Kitahorie 1-chome Nishi-ku Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakajima, Isao 4-4-17 Hattorihonmachi Toyonaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 02 /
Adachi, Tsutomu 2-7-3 Nishidai Itama-shi Hyogo-ken / JP | 03 /
Takeda, Shuichi 2-16-14 Ohasuhigashi Higashiosaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | 04 /
Tanaka, Ikuo 1352 Aomadani Mino-shi Osaka-fu / JP | [1983/22] | Representative(s) | Perry, Robert Edward, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1983/22] | Perry, Robert Edward, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 82305713.8 | 27.10.1982 | [1983/22] | Priority number, date | JP19810172289 | 27.10.1981 Original published format: JP 17228981 | [1983/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0080271 | Date: | 01.06.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1983 | Classification | IPC: | C07D209/28, A61K31/405 | [1983/22] | CPC: |
C07D209/28 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/22] | Title | German: | Indomethacinphenylester-Derivate, ihre Verwendung und diese enthaltende Zusammensetzungen | [1983/22] | English: | Indomethacin phenyl ester derivatives, their use, and compositions containing them | [1983/22] | French: | Dérivés d'esters phényliques d'indométhacine, leur utilisation et compositions les contenant | [1983/22] | File destroyed: | 26.04.1993 | Examination procedure | 11.11.1983 | Examination requested [1984/03] | 11.01.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 25.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1987/12] | 22.09.1986 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1987/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CS184941 ; | [A]CS184941 | [A] - Chemical Abstracts vol. 95, no. 1, 6 July 1981, Columbus, Ohio, USA, L. FISNEROVA et al. "Esters of 1-(p-chlorobenzoyl)-5-methoxy-2-methyl-3-indolylacetic acid", page 667, right-hand column, abstract no. 7061r & CS-A-184941, & CS184941 A 00000000 | [ ] - Chemical Abstracts vol. 88, no. 9, 27 February 1978, Columbus, Ohio, USA, L. FISNEROVA et al. "Pharmacologically interesting indomethacin derivates" page 373, right-hand column, abstract no. 62247m & Cesk. Farm. vol. 26, no. 6, 1977, pages 227-231 |