|
02.11.1994 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1994 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1994 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1994 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.09.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.08.1994 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1994 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1994 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.1994 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.06.1994 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.1994 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.03.1994 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.1994 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
23 |
|
11.03.1994 |
Documents for the maintenance of the patent as amended |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.1994 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.03.1994 |
Claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
01.03.1994 |
Description |
Opposition |
15 |
|
01.03.1994 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1994 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.1994 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.1993 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1993 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1993 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.08.1993 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.08.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.06.1993 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.1993 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
07.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.1993 |
F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.06.1993 |
F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.05.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.02.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.01.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
11 |
|
23.12.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.10.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1992 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1992 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.10.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.06.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
17 |
|
13.04.1992 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1992 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.04.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.1992 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.01.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.01.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
13 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.01.1992 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.08.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.08.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.08.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.07.1991 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.07.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.07.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.07.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.1991 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1991 |
Preparation of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.01.1991 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.01.1991 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.1990 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.07.1990 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.05.1990 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.05.1990 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
02.03.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.1989 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.1989 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.1989 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.12.1988 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.10.1988 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
15.07.1988 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.1988 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.1988 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.03.1988 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.03.1988 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
09.02.1988 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.01.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1988 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.1988 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.01.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1988 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.1987 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.12.1987 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.12.1987 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.1987 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.10.1987 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.1987 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.10.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.10.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.08.1987 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.08.1987 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1987 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.06.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.01.1987 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.1986 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
24.11.1986 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.11.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.11.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.1986 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.05.1986 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
31.05.1986 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.01.1986 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.08.1984 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.05.1984 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.1984 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.1984 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.1983 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.1982 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.1982 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.10.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
29.10.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1982 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
29.10.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |