|
11.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2000 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.1994 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1994 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.1994 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.1994 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1994 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.02.1994 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
03.11.1993 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.1993 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.1993 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.10.1993 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
05.08.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
28 |
|
05.08.1993 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.08.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.08.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1993 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.07.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.07.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.04.1993 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.1993 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1993 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.04.1993 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1993 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1993 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.03.1993 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
17.03.1993 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
17.03.1993 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.1993 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.03.1993 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.02.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.1993 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
12.02.1993 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.1993 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
19.01.1993 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.1993 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.12.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.1992 |
Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.1992 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.07.1992 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.1992 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.1992 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.06.1992 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.1992 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.1992 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.1992 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.05.1992 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.1992 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.1992 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.01.1992 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.1992 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.1992 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.1991 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.10.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
13.10.1991 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.09.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.09.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.1991 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.1991 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.1991 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.1991 |
Text intended for grant |
Opposition |
20 |
|
26.08.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
17.04.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.03.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.1991 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.1991 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1991 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.1991 |
Description |
Opposition |
8 |
|
08.02.1991 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.1991 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.01.1991 |
Invitation to file observations on a submission from a party in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.12.1990 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.11.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.11.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.10.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
09.10.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
25 |
|
09.10.1990 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.10.1990 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.10.1990 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.10.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
23.08.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.1990 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1990 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.07.1990 |
Communication (no form) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
07.02.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.02.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.02.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.02.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
07.02.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
10.01.1989 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.1989 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.1989 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1988 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1988 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1988 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Description |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
19.07.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
04.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.05.1988 |
Processing of an appeal |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.1988 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1988 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1988 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.1988 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.03.1988 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1987 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.1987 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.11.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.1987 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.10.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.1987 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.1987 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.10.1987 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.1987 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.1987 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.1987 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.08.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.06.1987 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.04.1987 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.1987 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.1986 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.1986 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.09.1986 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.09.1986 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.1986 |
Refund of fees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.05.1986 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.02.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.1986 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.01.1986 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1986 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.01.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.03.1985 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.02.1985 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1985 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
15.12.1984 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.12.1984 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.10.1984 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.1984 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.07.1984 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
22.05.1984 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.1983 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.1983 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1983 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.03.1983 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.11.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
22.11.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1982 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
22.11.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |