EP0074298 - Device for renewal air in a space [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.04.1984 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PATENTS AND RESEARCHES ESTABLISHMENT Société de droit du Liechtenstein dite: Eschen / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | For all designated states PATENTS AND RESEARCHES ESTABLISHMENT Société de droit du Liechtenstein dite: Eschen / LI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pedone, Antonio 13 Place Verte Tournai / BE | [1983/11] | Representative(s) | Bonnetat, Christian, et al Gevers France 41, avenue de Friedland 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1983/11] | Bonnetat, Christian, et al CABINET BONNETAT 23, Rue de St. Pétersbourg F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 82401540.8 | 16.08.1982 | [1983/11] | Priority number, date | FR19810016917 | 07.09.1981 Original published format: FR 8116917 | [1983/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0074298 | Date: | 16.03.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.1983 | Classification | IPC: | F24F7/08, F24J3/02 | [1983/11] | CPC: |
F24D5/02 (EP);
F24F12/001 (EP);
F24S10/25 (EP);
Y02B10/20 (EP);
Y02B30/56 (EP);
Y02E10/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1983/11] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Erneuerung der Raumluft | [1983/11] | English: | Device for renewal air in a space | [1983/11] | French: | Dispositif pour renouveler l'air d'un local | [1983/11] | File destroyed: | 14.07.1990 | Examination procedure | 20.12.1983 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1984/23] | 01.03.1984 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1984/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0029573 (KLIX UWE); | [X]DE2930990 (GRUEN WOLFGANG, et al); | [X]DE2929875 (KLOOS HORST RUEDIGER); | [Y]DE2944230 (KEMPF HELGA GEB WASMUTH); | [A]FR2438241 (COMP GENERALE ELECTRICITE); | [A]DE2819750 (PEDONE ANGELO) |