EP0082051 - Process for realising a cooling device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1983/25] | Process for realising a cooling arrangement with filiform elements for an electrical component, and arrangement so obtained | ||
[1987/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1987 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1983/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dassonville, René THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Bauchet, Philippe THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 03 /
Borget, Eugène THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 04 /
Laudren, Gildas THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1983/25] | Representative(s) | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Spott, Weinmiller & Böhm Patentanwälte Sendlinger-Tor-Platz 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | Weinmiller, Jürgen, et al Lennéstrasse 9 Postfach 24 D-82336 Feldafing / DE | ||
Former [1983/25] | Turlèque, Clotilde THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 82402215.6 | 03.12.1982 | [1983/25] | Priority number, date | FR19810023212 | 11.12.1981 Original published format: FR 8123212 | [1983/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0082051 | Date: | 22.06.1983 | Language: | FR | [1983/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0082051 | Date: | 11.01.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0082051 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1983 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20, H01J23/033 | [1983/25] | CPC: |
F28F3/022 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Kühlvorrichtung | [1987/02] | English: | Process for realising a cooling device | [1987/02] | French: | Procédé de réalisation d'un dispositif de refroidissement | [1987/02] |
Former [1983/25] | Verfahren zur Herstellung einer aus fadenförmigen Elementen bestehenden Kühlvorrichtung für ein elektrisches Bauelement und so hergestellte Vorrichtung | ||
Former [1983/25] | Process for realising a cooling arrangement with filiform elements for an electrical component, and arrangement so obtained | ||
Former [1983/25] | Procédé de réalisation d'un dispositif de refroidissement à éléments filiformes pour composant électronique, et dispositif de refroidissement ainsi obtenu | Examination procedure | 15.06.1984 | Examination requested [1984/34] | 28.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.1984 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB692885 (BROWN FINTUBE CO); | [Y]US2879041 (ROSS ROBERT T); | [A]FR1511618 (CHAUSSON USINES SA); | [A]DE1402770 (ROFFELSEN FRANCISCUS [NL]) |