|
31.10.1990 |
Transmission of the new certificate for a European patent pursuant to 87 EPC in conjunction with Rule 74 EPC |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.1990 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1990 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1990 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.1990 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.1990 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.08.1990 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.08.1990 |
Translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.08.1990 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.1990 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.05.1990 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.02.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.1990 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.1990 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
09.01.1990 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.01.1990 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
20 |
|
05.01.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
04.01.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.01.1990 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
22.12.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.12.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.1989 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
21.12.1989 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
21.12.1989 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.12.1989 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
19.12.1989 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
10.11.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.11.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.10.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.10.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.10.1989 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.10.1989 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1989 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1989 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1989 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.1989 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
25.10.1989 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.1989 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.04.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
27.01.1989 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.1989 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.01.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.12.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
14.12.1988 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.12.1988 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.12.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
05.12.1988 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
11.11.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.10.1988 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1988 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.1988 |
F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.10.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.1988 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.1988 |
F3043 Closure of the the appeal proceedings: failure to reply to a communication |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.1988 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.08.1988 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.07.1988 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.07.1988 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.07.1988 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.12.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.09.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.1987 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1987 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.1987 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
5 |
|
08.07.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.1987 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.05.1987 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.1987 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.1987 |
Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1987 |
Claims |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.02.1987 |
Drawings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.1987 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
17.12.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1986 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.1986 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1986 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1986 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.11.1986 |
N/A |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1986 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.11.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
05.11.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
05.11.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.11.1986 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
05.11.1986 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
05.11.1986 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.07.1986 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
24.02.1986 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.02.1986 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.1985 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.1985 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.1985 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.09.1985 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.05.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1985 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.1985 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.1985 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.1985 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.1985 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.05.1985 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1985 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.05.1985 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1985 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.1985 |
Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1985 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
22.03.1985 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1985 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.1984 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.11.1984 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
16.11.1984 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1984 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
16.09.1983 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.07.1983 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.06.1983 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.10.1982 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.1982 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.1982 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1982 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
13.09.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
13.09.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
23.06.1982 |
EPO/applicant correspondence crossed |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.1982 |
Invitation to file authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1982 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.1982 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1982 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1982 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.05.1982 |
Description |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
18.05.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1982 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.1982 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.05.1982 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |