|
27.02.2001 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.03.1992 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.1992 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.1992 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.01.1992 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.12.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.12.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
17.10.1991 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.10.1991 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.10.1991 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.10.1991 |
Request for re-establishment of rights |
Appeal |
3 |
|
01.10.1991 |
Submission concerning representation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.09.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.09.1991 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.09.1991 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.09.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.08.1991 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.08.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.08.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
09.08.1991 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
08.08.1991 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.1991 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1991 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.1991 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.1991 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.02.1991 |
Communication regarding time limit and form of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.1991 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.1991 |
Note on telephone consultation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1991 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
08.02.1991 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1991 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.1991 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
08.02.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
05.02.1991 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.10.1990 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.08.1990 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
10.07.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.07.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.1990 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.04.1990 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.04.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.04.1990 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.03.1990 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.03.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.1990 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1990 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.1989 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.1989 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.1989 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.09.1989 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.06.1989 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.1989 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.03.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1989 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.03.1989 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.03.1989 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.1989 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.01.1989 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.1988 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.10.1988 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.06.1988 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
22.04.1988 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of third party observations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.1988 |
Transmittal of third party observations to applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.03.1988 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.03.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.03.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.03.1988 |
Non-patent literature filed by a third party |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.1988 |
Observations by third parties |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.03.1988 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.03.1988 |
Patent document filed by a Third party |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
10.11.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.1987 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.1987 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1987 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.1987 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.1987 |
Interruption of proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.1987 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.1986 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.01.1986 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.1986 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.1986 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.12.1985 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.1983 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.01.1983 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.1982 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Delay of examination for Euro-PCT applications with WTO/TRIPS priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.1982 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.1982 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.1982 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1982 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1982 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.09.1982 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.1982 |
Written request for examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1982 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1982 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.1982 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.09.1982 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.1982 |
International publication (Pamphlet) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
02.09.1982 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
14.04.1982 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.1982 |
Letter relating to the search and/or examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
12.02.1982 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
5 |