EP0090377 - Finger-print identification system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1990 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINGERMATRIX INC. 30 Virginia Road North White Plains New York 10603 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | For all designated states FINGERMATRIX INC. 30 Virginia Road North White Plains New York 10603 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schiller, Michael 4465 Douglas Avenue Riverdale New York 10471 / US | [1983/40] | Representative(s) | Berkenfeld, Helmut An der Schanz 2 50735 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1983/40] | Berkenfeld, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. An der Schanz 2 03/3 D-50735 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 83102997.0 | 25.03.1983 | [1983/40] | Priority number, date | US19820362294 | 26.03.1982 Original published format: US 362294 | [1983/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0090377 | Date: | 05.10.1983 | Language: | EN | [1983/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0090377 | Date: | 28.03.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0090377 | Date: | 27.09.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/00, A61B5/10, A61B5/00 | [1984/13] | CPC: |
G06V10/20 (EP,US);
G06F18/00 (EP,KR);
G06V10/30 (EP,US);
G06V10/40 (EP,US);
G06V10/70 (EP,US);
G06V10/75 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1984/12] | G06K9/00, G06K9/00, A61B5/00 | ||
Former IPC [1983/40] | A61B5/00, G06K9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1983/40] | Title | German: | Fingerabdruck-Identifikationssytem | [1983/40] | English: | Finger-print identification system | [1983/40] | French: | Système d'identification des empreintes digitales | [1983/40] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.09.1984 | Examination requested [1984/49] | 27.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 05.12.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.12.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/36] | Request for further processing for: | 12.06.1989 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.1989 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.1989 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 25.04.1983 | AT   M02   Fee paid on   24.05.1983 | 25.04.1983 | BE   M02   Fee paid on   24.05.1983 | 25.04.1983 | CH   M02   Fee paid on   24.05.1983 | 25.04.1983 | DE   M02   Fee paid on   24.05.1983 | 25.04.1983 | FR   M02   Fee paid on   24.05.1983 | 25.04.1983 | GB   M02   Fee paid on   24.05.1983 | 25.04.1983 | IT   M02   Fee paid on   24.05.1983 | 25.04.1983 | NL   M02   Fee paid on   24.05.1983 | 25.04.1983 | SE   M02   Fee paid on   24.05.1983 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.1989 | BE | 27.09.1989 | CH | 27.09.1989 | IT | 27.09.1989 | LI | 27.09.1989 | NL | 27.09.1989 | SE | 27.09.1989 | [1999/42] |
Former [1991/12] | AT | 27.09.1989 | |
BE | 27.09.1989 | ||
CH | 27.09.1989 | ||
LI | 27.09.1989 | ||
NL | 27.09.1989 | ||
SE | 27.09.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | AT | 27.09.1989 | |
CH | 27.09.1989 | ||
LI | 27.09.1989 | ||
NL | 27.09.1989 | ||
SE | 27.09.1989 | ||
Former [1990/27] | CH | 27.09.1989 | |
LI | 27.09.1989 | ||
NL | 27.09.1989 | ||
SE | 27.09.1989 | ||
Former [1990/19] | CH | 27.09.1989 | |
LI | 27.09.1989 | ||
SE | 27.09.1989 | ||
Former [1990/18] | CH | 27.09.1989 | |
LI | 27.09.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3558864 (FRENCH WALTER K); | [A]DE2417282 (CALSPAN CORP); | [A]US4227805 (SCHILLER MICHAEL); | [X]GB1577797 (CALSPAN CORP); | [A]GB1583386 (ROCKWELL INTERNATIONAL CORP); | [APD]US4322163 (SCHILLER MICHAEL) | Examination | US4151512 |