|
02.12.1991 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.1991 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1991 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.1991 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.1991 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1991 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1991 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.1991 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.03.1991 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.03.1991 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.02.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.02.1991 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.11.1990 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.11.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.1990 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.09.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.09.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.09.1990 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.09.1990 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.08.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.1990 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.08.1990 |
Request for change of address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.1990 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.03.1990 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.1990 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.09.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.1989 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.1989 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.1989 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.08.1989 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.04.1989 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1989 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.1989 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.1989 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
14.04.1989 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
15.03.1989 |
Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.1989 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.1988 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.1988 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.1988 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.10.1988 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.10.1988 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.05.1988 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.1988 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.1988 |
Communication for party to proceedings/third party |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.1988 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.1988 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.03.1988 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.1988 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.03.1988 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1988 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1988 |
Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1988 |
Communication inviting to file observations after oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.02.1988 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1988 |
Description |
Opposition |
4 |
|
04.12.1987 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.11.1987 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.09.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.09.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.09.1987 |
Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.07.1987 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.1987 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
24.02.1987 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.1987 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.1987 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
22.12.1986 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.1986 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
03.02.1986 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1985 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.1985 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.1985 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1985 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.1985 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.09.1985 |
Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.09.1985 |
Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.1985 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.08.1985 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
06.08.1985 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.06.1984 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.06.1984 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1984 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.1984 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.12.1983 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1983 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1983 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.1983 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
11.07.1983 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.07.1983 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
15 |
|
11.07.1983 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
10 |