EP0101870 - Portable electrocardiologic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.1989 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KONTRON-HOLDING AG Bernerstrasse Süd 169 CH-8048 Zürich / CH | [1984/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marangoni, Daniele, Dr. Via Medici del Vascello n. 26 Mailand / IT | [1984/10] | Representative(s) | Körber, Wolfhart, et al Mitscherlich & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 33 06 09 80066 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1984/10] | Körber, Wolfhart, Dr.rer.nat., et al Patentanwälte Mitscherlich & Partner Postfach 33 06 09 D-80066 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83106967.9 | 15.07.1983 | [1984/10] | Priority number, date | CH19820004717 | 05.08.1982 Original published format: CH 471782 | [1984/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0101870 | Date: | 07.03.1984 | Language: | DE | [1984/10] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0101870 | Date: | 17.09.1986 | Language: | DE | [1986/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/04 | [1984/10] | CPC: |
A61B5/332 (EP,US);
A61B5/336 (EP,US);
A61B2560/0468 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1984/10] | Title | German: | Tragbares Elektrokardiologiegerät | [1984/10] | English: | Portable electrocardiologic apparatus | [1984/10] | French: | Appareil électrocardiologique portable | [1984/10] | File destroyed: | 13.07.1995 | Examination procedure | 15.07.1983 | Examination requested [1984/10] | 31.08.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/28] | 14.02.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1989/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]FR2519856 (MICRO MED [FR]); | [Y]DE2839331 (AMMERSCHLAEGER ALFONS ING GRAD, et al); | [Y]GB2070438 (ANDERSON J); | [A]DE2738605 (WOLFE DONNA LEE); | [A]US3651280 (STRECKMANN GEORGE L) | [A] - BIOMEDIZINISCHE TECHNIK, Band 25, Nr. 3, März 1980, Seite 70, Fachverlag Schiele + Schoen GmbH, Berlin, DE; H. SACHS: "Tragbarer EKG-Monitor mit einkanaligen EKG-SChreiber" |