EP0100552 - Hydrophilized membrane of porous hydrophobic material and process of producing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 07.09.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1991 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 23.10.1991 [1991/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8350 / JP | For all designated states SENKO MEDICAL INSTRUMENT Mfg Co., LTD No: 23-13, Hongo 3-Chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1984/07] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI RAYON CO., LTD. 3-19, Kyobashi 2-chome Chuo-Ku Tokyo 104 / JP | ||
For all designated states SENKO MEDICAL INSTRUMENT Mfg Co., LTD No: 23-13, Hongo 3-Chome Bunkyo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakanishi, Hikaru 5-404, Asohdai Danchi Shimoasoh Asoh-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1984/07] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr.rer.nat., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | ||
Former [1984/07] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem. Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 83107611.2 | 02.08.1983 | [1984/07] | Priority number, date | JP19820134853 | 02.08.1982 Original published format: JP 13485382 | [1984/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0100552 | Date: | 15.02.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0100552 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0100552 | Date: | 28.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/52] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0100552 | Date: | 23.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B01D65/00, // A61M1/34, C02F1/44 | [1991/43] | CPC: |
B01D67/0088 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249993 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/52] | B01D13/04, // A61M1/34, C02F1/44 | ||
Former IPC [1984/07] | B01D13/04, // A61M1/03, C02F1/44 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1984/07] | Title | German: | Hydrophilisierte Membran aus hydrophobem porösem Material und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1984/07] | English: | Hydrophilized membrane of porous hydrophobic material and process of producing same | [1984/07] | French: | Membrane à base d'un matériau poreux hydrophobe rendue hydrophile et son procédé de fabrication | [1984/07] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/46] | 13.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.1989
28.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE Enka AG Enka-Haus Kasinostrasse Postfach 10 01 49 D-42001 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/41] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.08.1989
28.08.1989
ADMISSIBLE Enka AG Enka-Haus Kasinostrasse Postfach 10 01 49 D-42001 Wuppertal / DE | 03.11.1989 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.05.1990 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.05.1990 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.1990 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.02.1991 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.02.1991 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 28.05.1991 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 31.07.1991 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP53080378 ; | [A]JP55136462 ; | [X]EP0046817 (GAMBRO INC [US]); | [X]FR2361439 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]); | [A]NL7306466 ; | [A]FR2391836 (MILLIPORE CORP [US]); | [A]GB2041821 (CELANESE CORP); | [A]FR2121818 (CELANESE CORP); | [A]US4280970 (KESTING ROBERT E) | [X] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 117, 29th September 1978, page 2245C78; & JP - A - 53 080 378 (SUMITOMO DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 15-07-1978, & JP53080378 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 7(E-41)(679), 17th January 1981; & JP-A-55 136 462 (HITACHI MAXELL K.K.) 24-10-1980, & JP55136462 A 00000000 |